Financial history The Gregg Schools Trust

Charity number: 1089055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.56m £5.61m £6.01m £6.34m £6.07m
Total expenditure £4.70m £5.21m £5.69m £6.23m £6.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £159.39k £123.93k £15.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £367 £2.21k £1.96k £4.41k £4.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.40m £5.05m £6.00m £6.32m £6.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £249 £77 £607 £10.75k £16.77k
Income - Other £159.39k £552.58k £7.35k £8.60k £1.77k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.70m £5.21m £5.69m £6.23m £6.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £34.28k £45.78k £33.11k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0