SOUTH ASIAN DIASPORA LITERATURES AND ARTS ARCHIVE (SALIDAA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SADAA is a South Asian Arts and Literature archive set up in 1999 by academics and arts practitioners who were concerned that the innovative and exciting contributions made by South Asians to the literary and artistic heritage of this country were in danger of being lost. Our purpose as a repository is to preserve and interpret this heritage and make it more accessible to future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2000: Standard registration
- SALIDAA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHYAMA PERERA | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Sapreena Kumari | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Toby Watley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
NEENA SOHAL | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RANJIT SONDHI | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
RINKU MITRA | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
BHAJAN HUNJAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.51k | £9.79k | £32.19k | £26.46k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.77k | £5.61k | £13.41k | £27.87k | £16.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 October 2020 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE OF LITERATURE AND ARTS PRODUCED BY WRITERS AND ARTISTS OF SOUTH ASIAN DESCENT LIVING IN ENGLAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 CHATSWORTH ROAD
LONDON
NW2 4BH
- Phone:
- 02084596527
- Email:
- rohanthamotheram@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window