LAW CENTRES FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve charitable need and financial hardship, provide assistance to Law Centres and encourage the formation of Law Centres in the United Kingdom. To advance the education of the public by assisting Law Centres in improving knowledge and practice of the law, and administration of justice in areas of the law which are of particular concern to poor people and directed to the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,096,978
Donations and legacies | £125.49k | |
Charitable activities | £965.74k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £478 | |
Other | £5.27k |
Total expenditure:
£1,064,592
Raising funds | £50.85k | |
Charitable activities | £1.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.85k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.01m | |
Retained for future use | £32.39k |
People

10 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 26 September 2001: Standard registration
- LAW CENTRES NETWORK (Working name)
- LCF (Working name)
- LCN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN CLAIRE DARBY ROGERS | Chair | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Christopher Stephens | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Celina Smith-Ihionvien | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
David Jackson | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Gareth Thomas | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS EUGENE WHITTINGHAM | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Clifton Weights | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sagar Kantilal Shah | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Stradling | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Elizabeth Nash | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Modupe Ayodeji Michael Fawole | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Victor Carmelle Alphonso McAllister | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ngaryan Higham | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Kandler | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sara Jean Mary Chandler | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Monica Robotham | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.53m | £4.57m | £1.06m | £912.59k | £1.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £4.42m | £1.23m | £1.07m | £1.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £723.85k | £3.37m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £111.34k | £288.28k | £159.85k | £169.24k | £125.49k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.40m | £4.25m | £893.97k | £728.69k | £965.74k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £49 | £105 | £37 | £169 | £478 | |
|
Income - Other | £23.47k | £34.24k | £3.75k | £14.49k | £5.27k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.65m | £4.40m | £1.19m | £1.03m | £1.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £27.21k | £29.48k | £37.45k | £43.48k | £50.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £14.08k | £14.99k | £11.36k | £28.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £3.45m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.13k | £2.95k | £2.25k | £1.05k | £224 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £800.49k | £730.43k | £574.89k | £439.82k | £507.63k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £343.40k | £126.39k | £139.67k | £160.05k | £194.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 2016 as amended on 08 Nov 2019 as amended on 08 Nov 2019 as amended on 08 Nov 2019 as amended on 15 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEED, IN PARTICULAR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AND IN SO DOING PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO LAW CENTRES AND ENCOURAGE THE FORMATION OF LAW CENTRES IN TH UNITED KINGDOM. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ASSISTING LAW CENTRES IN IMPROVING AND DIFFUSING KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW AND THE PRACTICE OF THE LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE, HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO POOR PEOPLE OR ARE DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lady Hale Gate
Gray's Inn
LONDON
WC1X 8BS
- Phone:
- 020 36371330
- Email:
- info@lawcentres.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window