Financial history THE CORN EXCHANGE (NEWBURY) TRUST

Charity Number: 1080567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.07m £2.05m £2.52m £2.49m £2.92m
Total expenditure £2.08m £1.69m £2.45m £2.43m £2.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £485.00k £576.71k £677.67k £321.28k £490.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £713.30k £1.12m £1.29m £910.62k £1.40m
Income - Other trading activities £245.40k £15.60k £144.80k £238.35k £296.72k
Income - Charitable activities £1.11m £535.40k £1.09m £1.33m £1.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.40k £1.60k £800 £5.20k £26.29k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.96m £1.67m £2.37m £2.33m £2.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £116.90k £23.00k £76.20k £107.27k £136.94k
Expenditure - Governance £47.30k £32.00k £58.20k £48.35k £7.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0