The Ivors Academy Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPONSORS OR UNDERTAKES RESEARCH ACTS AS UMBRELLA OR RESOURCE BODY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2000: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 February 2014: Re-registered
- BRITISH ACADEMY OF COMPOSERS AND SONGWRITERS TRUST (Previous name)
- BRITISH ACADEMY OF SONGWRITERS, COMPOSERS AND AUTHORS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Felix Howard | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Charles Bradbury | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Orphy Robinson | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Michelle Escoffery | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Shani Gonzales | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Francesca Malyan | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Julia Montero Cowell | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Charlotte Harris | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Adex | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Daniel K Poku | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sally Anne Gross | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Natasha Jane Baldwin | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Lucy Francis | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Leathem | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £16.06k | £68.14k | £565.08k | £122.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £14.06k | £104.55k | £259.57k | £240.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £564.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £124 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £242.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £221.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.64k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 18 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY THE SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 11 APRIL 2000 as amended on 14 Jan 2019 as amended on 29 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MUSIC AND ASSOCIATED SUBJECTS IN PARTICULAR BY 1. THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING SERVICES IN RESPECT OF COMPOSITION AND SONGWRITING; 2. THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AWARDS OR GRANTS TO SUCH PERSONS AND/OR PUPILS WHO ARE TALENTED, DESERVING AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR FAMILIES' FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR THEIR OWN IMPECUNIOSITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ivors Academy Trust
1 Upper James Street
London
W1F 9DE
- Phone:
- 02076362929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window