THE KING'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Prince's Trust's vision is that every young person should have the chance to succeed and its mission is to help young people transform their lives by developing the confidence and skills to live, learn and earn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£71,064,000
Donations and legacies | £53.39m | |
Charitable activities | £10.64m | |
Other trading activities | £6.56m | |
Investments | £476.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£69,581,000
Raising funds | £14.74m | |
Charitable activities | £54.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,692,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,613,000 from 76 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £54.84m | |
Retained for future use | £1.48m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £54.84m | |
Retained for future use | £6.18m |
People

1106 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
1948 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 30 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 4 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 September 2005: Standard registration
- 23 September 2005: Removed (Registered in error)
- KING'S TRUST (Previous name)
- THE KING'S TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PRINCE'S TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Segun Ilube CBE | Chair | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||
DEANNA OPPENHEIMER | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Dingemans | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikesh Kotecha OBE DL | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sian Evans | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Anne Efua Gloria Neubert | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pavita Cooper | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynne Weedall | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Armatrading MBE | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dearnley | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Oldfield | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.95m | £72.27m | £78.69m | £68.01m | £58.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.30m | £69.09m | £71.15m | £81.43m | £69.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £21.98m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.93m | £34.10m | £49.59m | £7.68m | £7.61m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £57.51m | £47.22m | £59.59m | £48.20m | £53.39m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.12m | £2.91m | £5.51m | £6.33m | £6.56m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.38m | £17.52m | £14.82m | £15.99m | £10.64m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £12.39m | £250.00k | £1.95m | £2.75m | £12.73m | |
|
Income - Investment | £779.00k | £245.00k | £173.00k | £208.00k | £476.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £155.00k | £4.39m | £550.00k | £122.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.03k | £224.00k | £1.70m | £538.00k | £859.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £62.13m | £57.28m | £58.39m | £56.84m | £54.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £15.17m | £11.81m | £12.76m | £15.52m | £14.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.00k | £223.00k | £281.00k | £20.63m | £23.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.37m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £73.00k | £70.00k | £200.00k | £26.90k | £358.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £9.07m | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £26.87m | £24.27m | £21.89m | £20.53m | £18.83m | |
|
Long-term investments | £21.69m | £29.51m | £38.81m | £41.63m | £57.29m | |
|
Other assets | £42.74m | £46.07m | £48.88m | £30.83m | £20.34m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £25.58m | £23.34m | £20.90m | £15.63m | £12.92m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 12 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED ON 09 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 08 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 06 FEB 2025
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED, TO INCLUDE: (A) PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION OR TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES, CRAFTS, TRADES OR THE SKILLS NEEDED IN EMPLOYMENT; (C) RELIEVING POVERTY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE) AND ENCOURAGEMENT WHILST THEIR EDUCATION IS BEING ADVANCED AS AFORESAID OR WHILST THEY ARE IN THE PROCESS OF ESTABLISHING NEW BUSINESSES OR PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGING IN A PROFESSION, TRADE, CRAFT OR SERVICE; (D) ARRANGING PERIODS OF VOLUNTARY WORK IN THE COMMUNITY; AND (E) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF AND PRACTICAL ACTION IN SUPPORT OF THE NATURAL AND BUILD ENVIRONMENT. (11) TO PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO SOCIAL CONDITIONS AFFECTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL NEED OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (111) TO CARRY OUT ANY SUCH APPROVED OBJECTS (AS DEFINED BY REGULATION 33 OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 OR ANY AMENDMENT THERETO) AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY TO DO SO. (IV) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 14 September 2005 : Standard registration
- 23 September 2005 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Princes Trust
8 Glade Path
LONDON
SE1 8EG
- Phone:
- 02075431234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window