THE ROYAL OPERA HOUSE ENDOWMENT FUND 2000

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the education of the public in the arts of opera and ballet by making grants to, or for the benefit of, the Royal Opera House or the educational activities of the Royal Ballet School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£8,365,925
Donations and legacies | £913.73k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.15m | |
Other | £6.30m |
Total expenditure:
£2,608,288
Raising funds | £284.29k | |
Charitable activities | £2.32m | |
Other | £0 |
£52,292 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £284.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.32m | |
Retained for future use | £5.76m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £284.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.32m | |
Retained for future use | £5.81m |
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 January 2002: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL OPERA HOUSE ENDOWMENT FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME Vivien Louise Duffield DBE | Chair | 20 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Simon Freakley | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Britton | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
LADY KATHARINE SUSAN GAVRON | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Hamish Forsyth | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BRIAN BUNTING | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Sir Simon Christopher Robey | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84m | £1.75m | £2.61m | £2.29m | £8.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70m | £2.53m | £2.68m | £6.37m | £2.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.36m | £620.44k | £1.90m | £1.80m | £913.73k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48m | £1.13m | £711.92k | £489.36k | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.30m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.36m | £620.44k | £1.90m | £1.62m | £843.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.42m | £2.25m | £2.43m | £6.07m | £2.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £282.55k | £279.59k | £255.38k | £295.76k | £284.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.42m | £2.25m | £2.43m | £6.07m | £2.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £255.48k | £261.11k | £246.49k | £275.45k | £269.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £1 | £100.00k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £39.15m | £38.58m | £39.08m | £38.33m | £38.27m | |
|
Other assets | £11.23m | £8.65m | £12.51m | £8.62m | £14.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.24m | £101.47k | £65.40k | £253.32k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF OPERA AND BALLET BY MAKING GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ROYAL OPERA HOUSE, COVENT GARDEN LIMITED (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 211775) ("ROH") AND (IN RELATION TO GRANTS FALLING WITHIN SUB-CLAUSE 2.1. 3 BELOW) THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 214364) ("RBS") OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR OR TOWARDS ANY OF THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSES 2.1.1 TO 2.1.8 BELOW AND OUT OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND FOR OT TOWARDS ANY OF THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSE 2.1.9. BELOW:- INCOME GRANTS: 2.1.1 PRESENTING PRODUCTIONS OF OPERAS AND BALLETS; 2.1.2 COMMISSIONING NEW WORKS OF OPERAS AND BALLET; 2.1.3 SUPPORTING THE EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND ACTIVITIES OF ROH OR RBS; 2.1.4 PUBLISHING THE SCORES OR LIBRETTI OF OPERAS AND BALLETS AND ANY OTHER BOOKS, BOOKLETS OR PAMPHLETS WHICH RELATE TO THE ACTIVITIES OF ROH; 2.1.5 PURCHASING COPYRIGHTS OR OTHER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY RIGHTS OF OR IN OPERAS, BALLETS AND THE MUSICAL WORKS; 2.1.6 RECORDING, FILMING, VIDEOING OR BROADCASTING OPERAS, BALLETS AND OTHER MUSICAL WORKS 2.1.7 MAINTAINING, REPAIRING, RENEWING, IMPROVING OR EXTENDING ANY LAND, BUILDINGS, PLANT, MACHINERY OR ANY OTHER ASSETS OWNED BY ROH; 2.1.8 ACQUIRING, MAINTAINING AND PRESERVING CHATTELS OR OTHER ASSETS WHICH ARE HISTORICALLY ASSOCIATED WITH ROH OR ANY BUILDING OWNED OR OCCUPIED BY ROH; CAPITAL GRANTS: 2.1.9 RENEWING, IMPROVING OR EXTENDING ANY BUILDINGS, PLANT OR MACHINERY OWNED BY ROH PROVIDED THAT AT THE TIME OF THE GRANT THE TRUSTEES (ACTING UNANIMOUSLY) HAVE A CLEAR POLICY FOR RESTORING TO THE TRUST FUND THE AMOUNT OF THE GRANT ( WHETHER OUT OF FUTURE INCOME OR FUTURE DONATIONS) WITHIN A PERIOD OF FIVE YEARS OR IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES ONLY SUCH LONGER PERIOD (NOT EXCEEDING 10 YEARS) AS THE TRUSTEES AGREE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL OPERA HOUSE
COVENT GARDEN
LONDON
WC2E 9DD
- Phone:
- 02072129664
- Email:
- Leah.Hurst@roh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window