Financial history THE MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1083230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £27.15k £42.30k £7.78k £8.10k £5.43k
Total expenditure £29.53k £32.91k £20.12k £9.41k £8.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A