THE BRITISH DOUBLE REED SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fosters the arts and science of double reed musical instruments - most particularly the oboe and the bassoon. It assists in running workshops/courses and holds an annual event with international artists. It provides a thrice-yearly magazine for members and offers discounts with some traders in the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2000: Standard registration
- B D R S (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James William Turnbull | Chair | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liam David Fleet | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caron de Burgh | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Sarah Ruth Williams | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Eric Haworth | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Denby | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donal Flynn | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hubbard | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jean Wathey | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fuller | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN CROWTHER | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.14k | £24.97k | £24.39k | £25.34k | £75.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.63k | £20.35k | £20.86k | £23.33k | £24.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND FOSTER INTEREST, EDUCATION, STUDY, DEVELOPMENT AND PARTICIPATION IN THE ART OF MUSIC AND MUSIC MAKING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS INVOLVING DOUBLE REED WOODWIND INSTRUMENTS PARTICULARLY THOSE OF THE OBOE AND BASSOON FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Park Avenue
BATH
BA2 4QD
- Phone:
- 01225 429351
- Email:
- secretary@bdrs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window