THIRLBY RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is, in the interests of social welfare, to improve the conditions of the life of the inhabitants of the area, without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, by the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure-time occupation.(The area of benefit is the Parish of Thirlby, and the area within one mile of Thirlby Village Hall)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Swallow | Chair | 27 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Sarah McClive | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hanratty | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.45k | £3.37k | £4.87k | £7.46k | £7.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.67k | £3.22k | £5.47k | £4.64k | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF THIRLBY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF THIRLBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HICKORINGILL
THIRLBY
THIRSK
YO7 2DJ
- Phone:
- 07557365960
- Email:
- tra@thirlbyvillage.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window