Trustees NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS AND NON-MAINTAINED SPECIAL SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1083632

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Tresman | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Bond | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simone Hopkins | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gosling | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robson | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Gareth Germer | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Turberville | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Farnden | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jones | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Dalgleish | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny McConnell | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.