THE MAGNA CARTA TRUST FOR SALISBURY CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Magna carta Trust seeks to promote the advancement of religion and education for the public benefit in relation to the work of Salisbury Cathedral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 June 2000: Standard registration
- THE MAGNA CARTA TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Very Rev'd Nicholas Charles Papadopulos | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
ANTHONY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
SIR CHRISTOPHER BENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
DAME ROSEMARY SPENCER DCMG CMG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
LORD COLIN SHARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £10 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIMES, IN SUCH MANNER, AND SUBJECT TO SUCH RESTRICTIONS (IF ANY) , AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN SO FAR AS THE SAME SHALL RELATE TO SALISBURY CATHEDRAL AND ITS ENVIRONS. 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR A PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY CATHEDRAL AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 THE CLOSE
SALISBURY
SP1 2EF
- Phone:
- 01722 555108
- Email:
- finance@salcath.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window