HATZLOCHO LIMITED


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, with particular emphasis on Jewish education and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Israel
Governance
- 17 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Michael Kremen | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|||
Michael Julian Blake | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.19k | £35.96k | £37.76k | £39.64k | £147 | |
|
Total expenditure | £564.04k | £3.66k | £20.16k | £44.45k | £301.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2021 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2021 | 331 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH. (11) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (111) FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BOTH THE UK AND ABROAD RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE BY ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
UK AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SPANIARDS PARK
COLUMBAS DRIVE
LONDON
NW3 7JD
- Phone:
- 02084552827
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window