Trustees NEWARK AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1086495

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA CROWE | Chair | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Thomas Sargeant | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Knowles | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Handisides-Dewsnap | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Tallis | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aston Fisher | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Chrimes | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Leggett | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Stubbs | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dawn Angela Stubbs | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Margaret Brown | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Martin | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Follen | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Crowe | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.