Financial history DRAYCOTT AND RODNEY STOKE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1082140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.11k £5 £2.01k £2.20k £2.30k
Total expenditure £189 £0 £2.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A