Financial history COMUNIDAD ISRAELITA ORTODOXA OF ARGENTINA

Charity number: 1084438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 07/07/2024
Total gross income £50.71k £11.22k £30.75k £33.33k £58.05k
Total expenditure £43.33k £37.42k £35.51k £32.18k £51.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A