THE HASTINGS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1081252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Objects of the Charity are to: advance the Christian faith; relieve persons who are in condition of need, hardship or distress; educate and assist young people through their leisure time activities so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacity; advance education in family life, in marriage and family relationships; and advance Christian religious education and training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • KINGS CHURCH HASTINGS (Working name)
  • THE HASTINGS CENTRE (Working name)
  • KC HASTINGS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Rackstraw Chair 12 May 2022
None on record
Theresa Mummery Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Margaret Nevey Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Oliver Raymond Dyer Trustee 14 July 2016
None on record
MARTIN HUGH CLARKE Trustee 29 January 2011
None on record
Natalie Anne Williams Trustee 01 July 2009
JUBILEE+
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.02m £1.52m £1.04m £1.13m £1.53m
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.09m £1.06m £1.26m £1.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £707 £65.74k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £70.00k £135.47k £139 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £548.47k £1.22m £720.63k £683.30k £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities £462.18k £293.39k £314.67k £440.72k £445.91k
Income - Charitable activities £8.09k £2.97k £383 £10.46k £24.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £849 £1.02k £132 £67 £3.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £110.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £770.27k £861.77k £708.96k £928.85k £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £282.44k £227.77k £348.80k £330.59k £369.97k
Expenditure - Governance £8.00k £8.00k £8.00k £10.00k £10.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.15k £0 £12.46k £28.62k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £1.30m £1.79m £1.79m £1.75m £1.71m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £458.80k £845.46k £841.28k £669.09k £772.02k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £289.47k £734.19k £754.48k £670.33k £637.66k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 September 2022 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 12 September 2022 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE HASTINGS CENTRE
THE RIDGE
HASTINGS
TN34 2SA
Phone:
01424755990