Financial history THE FACIAL SURGERY RESEARCH FOUNDATION - SAVING FACES

Charity number: 1081214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £128.09k £151.64k £201.81k £120.44k £332.27k
Total expenditure £304.71k £287.22k £167.60k £170.07k £163.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.44k £34.49k N/A N/A N/A