THE FACIAL SURGERY RESEARCH FOUNDATION - SAVING FACES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saving Faces aims to reduce the incidence of oral cancers, injury and disfigurement by leading and promoting research into the prevention, causes and treatment of these conditions. We fund the National Facial, Oral and Oculoplastic Research Centre, the National Head and Neck Audit, a patient-to-patient helpline, the Saving Faces Diagnostic Advice Service, PhD studentships and clinical fellowships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2000: Standard registration
- FSRF SAVING FACES (Working name)
- SAVING FACES (Working name)
- SAVING FACES THE FACIAL SURGERY RESEARCH CHARITY (Working name)
- THE FACIAL SURGERY RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SAVING FACES THE ORAL AND FACIAL SURGERY RESEARCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLIOTT BERNERD | Chair |
|
||||||
SIMON BENTLEY | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Austen Smith | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Atul Setia | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER HARDEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PATRICK MAGENNIS Deputy Chair | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.09k | £151.64k | £201.81k | £120.44k | £332.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.71k | £287.22k | £167.60k | £170.07k | £163.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.44k | £34.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 28.4.00
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, INPARTICULAR BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ORAL AND FACIAL DISEASES, DISORDERS AND INJURIES (AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) AT THE DEPARTMENT OF ORAL AND MAXILLO FACIAL SURGERY AT THE BARTS AND LONDON HOSPITAL OR AT THE ORAL AND MAXILLO FACIAL SURGERY DEPARTMENTS OF SUCH OTHER HOSPITALS OR INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 TONBRIDGE STREET
LONDON
WC1H 9DZ
- Phone:
- 02034177757
- Email:
- info@savingfaces.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window