THE PLAYGROUND THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Playground Studio provides the conditions that are essential to the creative theatre making process by providing space, inviting leading artists/teachers to run workshops on specialised subjects and by encouraging individuals within the group to lead workshops on their own personal specialties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2001: Standard registration
- THE PLAYGROUND STUDIO (Working name)
- FUSION THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- THE PLAYGROUND PERFORMING ARTS STUDIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Davies | Chair | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Anni Domingo | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS NAOMI SORKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.31k | £260.06k | £238.56k | £312.85k | £243.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.61k | £167.16k | £302.46k | £315.94k | £281.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daniel Wolfson & Co Ltd
DNS House
382 Kenton Road
HARROW
Greater London
HA3 8DP
- Phone:
- 01923856008
- Email:
- info@the-playground.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window