Accounts and annual returns EMMER GREEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1087387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 December 2023 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 December 2023 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 September 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 September 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 October 2021 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 October 2021 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late Download Open in new window