THE CATERHAM SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activity is to provide grants to be used as bursaries for pupils whose parents would otherwise be unable to afford to send them to Caterham School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 October 2000: Standard registration
- 29 September 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 29 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1109508 CATERHAM SCHOOL
- THE OLD CATERHAMIANS' TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £14.54k | £9.22k | £1.54k | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 July 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT CATERHAM SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2. TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS AND BURSARIES FOR THE EDUCATION AND MAINTENANCE OF SUCH PERSONS ENTERING OR ALREADY ATTENDING CATERHAM SCHOOL AT SUCH TIMES AND ON SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF FORMER PUPILS OF CATERHAM SCHOOL AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window