THE RUSLAND VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes community activities and projects in the Rusland Valley and the neighbouring parishes of Satterthwaite and Colton. It also provides grants to individuals in support of activities designed to increase skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 27 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Wynne Wingate-Saul | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BOYREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGUS STANLEY HYDE ADAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
TESS BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £4.77k | £5.30k | £4.82k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07k | £728 | £1.29k | £4.16k | £2.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE RUSLAND VALLEY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FROM TIME TO TIME FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ASSIST EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE PARISH OF SATTERTHWAITE OR THE PARISH OF COLTON THAT WILL BE OF BENEFIT TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE RUSLAND VALLEY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE EXAMPLES OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES AS TO THE DATE OF THE SETTLEMENT ARE: ST PAUL'S CHURCH RUSLAND RUSLAND READING ROOM PARENT AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION AT SATTERTHWAITE & RUSLAND CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL RUSLAND YOUNG FARMERS RUSLAND VALLEY HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY SATTERTHWAITE RECREATION GROUND THE QUAKER MEETING HOUSE ROOK HOW RUSLAND 2)TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO THE SATTERTHWAITE & RUSLAND CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL AND ANY SUCCESSOR THEREOF PROVIDED THAT SUCH FACILITIES SHALL NOT BE USED TO PROVIDE STATUTORY FACILITIES 3) TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE PARISH OF COLTON BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FROM TIME TO TIME FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ASSIST EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE PARISH OF COLTON WHICH WILL BE OF BENEFIT TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISHES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
RUSLAND VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Light Hall
Rusland
ULVERSTON
Cumbria
LA12 8JT
- Phone:
- 01229860316
- Email:
- anguslighthall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window