RICH MIX CULTURAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of the public in art and culture of all types; to work towards the elimination of racial discrimination; to promote equality of opportunity and good relations between people of different racial groups, particularly by promoting events and activities to foster intercultural diversity of migrant communities and their contribution to the economic and cultural life of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,526,956
Donations and legacies | £560.08k | |
Charitable activities | £660.09k | |
Other trading activities | £1.30m | |
Investments | £8.72k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,151,730
Raising funds | £87.60k | |
Charitable activities | £2.13m | |
Other | £938.29k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,802 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.03m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.13m |
People

53 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 31 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Priti Patel-May | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Angelina Bernadette John | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Elizabeth Houghton | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Gruenenfelder | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Bhavisha Goolab | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Kilvington | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ansuya Vezendy | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Vineet Jasooja | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sangna CHAUHAN | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dylan James HASKINS | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Jackie O'Sullivan | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SHAMIM AZAD | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DENISE JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77m | £3.01m | £2.77m | £2.29m | £2.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23m | £2.38m | £2.73m | £2.89m | £3.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.45k | £1.42m | £860.30k | £426.08k | £14.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.96k | £7.70k | £12.32k | £17.69k | £560.08k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.51m | £105.98k | £608.87k | £881.00k | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £875.52k | £2.45m | £2.09m | £1.39m | £660.09k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.06k | £301 | £127 | £4.05k | £8.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £374.46k | £444.81k | £62.55k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.08m | £1.78m | £2.03m | £2.01m | £2.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £29.25k | £78.19k | £68.83k | £74.07k | £87.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.03k | £22.57k | £30.85k | £35.03k | £38.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £5.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.11m | £523.06k | £636.79k | £806.82k | £938.29k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.39m | £12.97m | £13.33m | £13.06m | £12.70m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £642.91k | £1.85m | £1.41m | £1.04m | £839.11k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £542.40k | £592.88k | £585.53k | £548.53k | £606.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 SEP 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 MAY 2002 AND 25 OCT 2010. as amended on 04 May 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF CULTURAL DIVERSITY OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES AND THEIR CONTRIBUTIONS TO ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL LIFE PARTICULARLY BY ESTABLISHING THE RICH MIX CENTRE AS A HOME FOR EXHIBITIONS AND BY COLLECTING PRESERVING AND EXHIBITING ITEMS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE. B.) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ART AND CULTURE OF ALL TYPES. C.) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS PARTICULARLY BY PROMOTING EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER INTERCULTURAL UNDERSTANDING, INCLUSIVENESS AND TOLERANCE AND TO PROMOTE THE VALUE OF CULTURAL ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35-47 BETHNAL GREEN ROAD
LONDON
E1 6LA
- Phone:
- 02076137498
- Email:
- finance@richmix.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window