ROCHFORD AND RAYLEIGH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED

Charity number: 1082949
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the Bureau is the provision of free, confidential, independent and impartial advice, information and counsel for members of the public, ensuring that individuals do not suffer through lack of knowledge or an inability to express their needs effectively.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £105,315
Total expenditure: £115,915

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 2000: Standard registration
  • 06 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 06 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1113231 Citizens Advice Braintree & South Essex Limited
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £231.00k £151.71k £94.32k £114.81k £105.32k
Total expenditure £238.21k £187.53k £107.14k £108.52k £115.92k
Income from government contracts £60.00k £0 £0 £80.14k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £79.74k £76.06k £1.80k £85.73k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 July 2016 On Time