THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to Guildhall School of Music & Drama to advance the education of students and prospective students of the School in music, drama & production arts and any other object considered to be beneficial to the promotion of music, drama & production arts. To support any charitable purpose in which Guildhall School or any student may engage and promotes music, drama & production arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£2,789,084
Donations and legacies | £2.38m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £15.00k | |
Investments | £394.49k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,565,402
Raising funds | £10.58k | |
Charitable activities | £2.55m | |
Other | £0 |
-£334,044 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.58k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.55m | |
Retained for future use | £223.68k |
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH LINCOLN | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Matthew David Green | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Charles Miezitis | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Xiao Rong Li-Yan-Hui | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gina Hartnett | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Christopher James Warren | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gunjan Sharma | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Benn | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Caroline Stockmann | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Noel | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Andrew Vaughan | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rongrong Huo | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Laidlaw | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ernest Alexander Constable | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64m | £1.49m | £1.54m | £1.76m | £2.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02m | £2.15m | £2.00m | £1.98m | £2.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.24m | £1.04m | £1.54m | £2.55m | £2.38m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £51.79k | £15.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £29.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £741.22k | £62.37k | £410.20k | £1.27m | £319.58k | |
|
Income - Investment | £365.15k | £410.83k | £356.32k | £382.04k | £394.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £35.58k | £51.31k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £410.20k | £1.27m | £459.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £2.12m | £1.99m | £1.96m | £2.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £52.52k | £34.47k | £12.53k | £15.19k | £10.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £121.26k | £78.26k | £89.40k | £82.05k | £91.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.85m | £2.04m | £1.90m | £1.88m | £2.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £34.60k | £34.47k | £12.53k | £15.19k | £10.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £731.04k | £1.86m | £2.60m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.36m | £11.24m | £11.57m | £11.05m | £10.72m | |
|
Other assets | £1.35m | £540.49k | £557.98k | £488.44k | £1.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £240.68k | £360.72k | £340.57k | £346.21k | £2.16m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27TH JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS (“STUDENTS”) OF THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL OF MUSIC & DRAMA (“THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL”) IN MUSIC OR DRAMA (INCLUDING STAGE MANAGEMENT AND RELATED PRODUCTION AND DESIGN) AND ANY OTHER OBJECT CONSIDERED BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE BENEFICIAL TO THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC AND DRAMA (INCLUDING STAGE MANAGEMENT AND RELATED PRODUCTION AND DESIGN) AT THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL; AND 3.2 TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN WHICH THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL OR ANY STUDENT MAY ENGAGE AND WHICH PROMOTES MUSIC OR DRAMA (INCLUDING STAGE MANAGEMENT AND RELATED PRODUCTION AND DESIGN).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- CHARLOTTE ANTOINETTE TRYDELL ORGAN SCHOLARSHIP
- EDWIN EVANS FOUNDATION
- ERIC CUNDELL MEMORIAL FUND
- NOEL MILLIDGE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- PAUL KATZ MEMORIAL PRIZE
- SAM HEILBUT SCHOLARSHIPS FUND
- STUDENTS ENDOWMENT FUND (FOUNDED BY F D BOWLES J P )
- THE EDITH MAY CATTELL SCHOLARSHIP
- THE FORFEITED DEPOSIT FEES SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- THE GUIDHALL SCHOOL OF MUSIC GOLD MEDALS FUND
- THE HUDDERSFIELD 1980 SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- THE MADAME WARSHAW DRAMATIC LITERATURE PRIZE AND OTHER PRIZES
- THE SUSAN MARY LONGFIELD MEMORIAL AWARD
- WILLIAM GANZ FUND
- 01 June 1981 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
GUILDHALL SCHOOL OF MUSIC & DRAMA
SILK STREET
BARBICAN
LONDON
EC2Y 8DT
- Phone:
- 0207382 7157
- Email:
- rachel.davis@gsmd.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window