Financial history GLEBELANDS PRE-SCHOOL AND OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1082574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £171.75k £159.27k £157.04k £135.49k £182.51k
Total expenditure £132.65k £127.74k £137.57k £136.13k £172.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.00k N/A N/A N/A