Financial history STUDIO VOLTAIRE

Charity number: 1082221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.80m £2.28m £1.69m £1.28m £1.22m
Total expenditure £916.77k £764.44k £1.27m £1.44m £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £445.82k £929.34k £387.23k £24.99k £84.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £950.34k £1.84m £836.13k £422.63k £439.41k
Income - Other trading activities £694.54k £248.75k £424.74k £611.73k £430.73k
Income - Charitable activities £144.00k £407.26k £423.50k £187.05k £273.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £4.87k £2.19k £275 £465
Income - Other £0 £14.20k £0 £56.47k £75.98k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.84m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £625.32k £651.95k £1.15m £1.18m £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £291.45k £112.49k £119.91k £255.74k £106.85k
Expenditure - Governance £4.50k £4.09k £4.52k £38.41k £39.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £31.40k £0 £11.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0