FIVE PILLARS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Five Pillars provide emergency aid across UK and internationally. We seek to reduce the immediate suffering in a crisis, followed by support for long term redevelopment of disrupted communities to improve quality of their lives through education, housing and employment projects. We lead and also work in a collaborative model to easy trauma and suffering and to improve quality of human lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 27 September 2000: Standard registration
- FIVE PILLARS CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARIF HUSSAIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Hatim Qureshi | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.33k | £9.63k | £7.61k | £23.76k | £4.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.75k | £4.30k | £869 | £18.54k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2025 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS IN PAKISTAN PARTICULARY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HOMES, ORPHANAGES OR OTHER SUCH INSTITUTIONS 2.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN PAKISTAN AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG CHILDREN AND THE ELDERLY MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE LANGUAGE RELIGION AND CULTURES OF PAKISTAN AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND THE ELDERLY PAKISTANI COMMUNITY; IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE PAKISTANI ELDERLY AND CHILDREN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH FINANCIAL HELP TO OLD PEOPLES HOMES EYE CAMPS DISTRIBUTION OF FOOD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PAKISTAN; THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG ORPHANED CHILDREN AND THE ELDERLY COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PAKISTAN
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
12
White Hart Street
HIGH WYCOMBE
Bucks
HP11 2HL
- Phone:
- 07973743731
- Email:
- info@fivepillarscharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window