MITCHAM COMMON EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes and undertakes educational activities about Mitcham Common.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Merton
- Sutton
Governance
- 23 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Jenifer Gould | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Councillor Martin Whelton | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | £1.47k | £467 | £1.00k | £686 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THE STUDY OF THE BIODIVERSITY AND HISTORY OF LAND CALLED MITCHAM COMMON LYING WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF MERTON AND SUTTON, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ITS FLORA AND FAUNA, ECOLOGY, NATURE CONSERVATION, GEOGRAPHY, GEOLOGY, HYDROLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACCESS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO THE EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES OF MITCHAM COMMON.
Area of benefit
MERTON AND SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL HOUSE
ECOLOGY CENTRE
WINDMILL HOUSE
WINDMILL ROAD
MITCHAM
CR4 1HT
- Phone:
- 02082880453
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window