THE VERA SMART TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion,improvement,development and maintenance of public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 09 May 2001: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 January 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Edith King | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JEREMY SIMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH STEWART FUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £645 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £4.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS BY: - (A) THE PRESENTATION OF OR THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS BEING LAID ON THE PROMOTION OF CHAMBER MUSIC WITHIN THE AREA OF THE COUNTY AND CITY OF SWANSEA AND LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING IT AND (B) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIP BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE OR TRAVEL ALLOWANCES AT ANY SCHOOL UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS UNDER TWENTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY AND CITY OF SWANSEA AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING IT FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICIANS OR MUSIC STUDENTS OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
COUNTY AND CITY OF SWANSEA AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Yr Hafan
SWANSEA
SA1 8RD
- Phone:
- 01792731010
- Email:
- reception@harrisarnold.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window