Financial history THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ALDERSHOT BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1083261
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.00k £800 £800 £750 £2.00k
Total expenditure £600 £300 £600 £500 £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A