Trustees THE WINCHESTER LIDO SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1085447
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Burgess | Chair | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Craig | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Wheadon | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Anne MacMahon Burns | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Wall | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Callum Wright | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Gary Peter Sorensen | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Nigel Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Winchester Lido Sports Association Trustee Limited | Trustee | 30 May 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.