CLONTER FARM MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides high quality training and experience of performing publicly for persons embarking on professional musical careers in the United Kingdom, and to establish such courses of training and tuition and such public concert stage and other performances as the trustees shall see fit. The charity achieves its objectives through the staging of opera performances, and awarding an annual opera prize
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£532,373
Donations and legacies | £200.93k | |
Charitable activities | £317.70k | |
Other trading activities | £12.72k | |
Investments | £1.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£565,667
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £565.67k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £565.67k |
People

2 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- CLONTER OPERA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren John Billings | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nicholas Mathias | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZA-JANE BLOOD | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MEADMORE | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH PATRICIA FARMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lady KIRSTY PILKINGTON DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.29k | £348.14k | £351.93k | £472.31k | £532.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £424.04k | £232.05k | £324.31k | £478.19k | £565.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £29.50k | £27.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200.93k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.72k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £317.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.02k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £565.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.53k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £177.27k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 AUGUST 2000 AND 27 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY TRAINING AND EXPERIENCE OF PERFORMING PUBLICLY FOR PERSONS EMBARKING ON PROFESSIONAL MUSICAL CAREERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO THIS END (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO ESTABLISH SUCH COURSES OF TRAINING AND TUITION AND SUCH PUBLIC CONCERT STAGE AND OTHER PERFORMANCES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT 2) TO PAY ALL OR PART OF THE EXPENSES OF PERSONS INCURRED IN ATTENDING SUCH COURSES REFERRED TO IN CLAUSE 3.1 (INCLUDING TRAVEL EXPENSES) 3) TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR STUDENTS AT SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES IN THE APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF OPERA 4) TO ARRANGE FOR TOURING COMPANIES OF OPERA SINGERS TO VISIT SCHOOLS COLLEGES SOCIAL CLUBS AND OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK APPROPRIATE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PERFORMING OPERAS OR EXTRACTS THEREFROM 5) TO PAY ALL OR PART OF THE FEES OF STUDENTS OF MUSIC IN RESPECT OF MUSICAL OR EDUCATIONAL COURSES AT UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEAGUES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL OR MUSICAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM 6) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE MEMBERS BEING NOT LESS THAN THREE IN NUMBER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME UNANIMOUSLY DECLARE 7) TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE MEMBERS BEING NOT LESS THAN THREE IN NUMBER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clonter Opera Theatre
Swettenham Heath
Congleton
CW12 2LR
- Phone:
- 01260224638
- Email:
- clonter@clonter.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window