CHICHESTER CATHEDRAL CHORISTERS' ASSOCIATION'S SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for educational fees for choristers of Chichester Cathedral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2002: Standard registration
- CCCA TRUST FOR CHORISTERS' SCHOLARSHIPS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Lawrence Jenner | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Francis Attwater | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Canon Nason David | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW TIMOTHY PORTER MA, MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TIM INGRAM HILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.78k | £20.89k | £23.41k | £31.33k | £30.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.99k | £16.15k | £19.96k | £20.63k | £21.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 MAY 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
(1)TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION AND MUSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF ONE OR MORE BOYS SINGING IN THE CATHEDRAL CHOIR AT CHICHESTER CATHEDRAL. (2)THE TRUSTEES MAY, AT THEIR DISCRETION, CONTINUE TO PAY A CURRENTLY AWARDED BURSARY TO A BOY WHO HAS HAD REASON TO LEAVE THE CHOIR PRIOR TO HIS LEAVING THE CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOL (THE PREBENDAL SCHOOL).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 ALWYN ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 5EJ
- Phone:
- 01628788757
- Email:
- a.t.porter@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window