Financial history AMBASSADORS OF CHRIST (GLOBAL)

Charity number: 1090964
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.48k £12.72k £13.60k £24.71k £33.62k
Total expenditure £36.47k £11.07k £16.09k £24.13k £32.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £350 £2.55k £3.75k