WALLSEND BATTLE HILL (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1082620
Charity reporting is overdue by 532 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MONTHLY MEETING WHERE WE HAVE INVITED SPEAKERS ON A VARIETY OF TOPICS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022

Total income: £1,614
Total expenditure: £2,228

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Audrey Ilderton Trustee
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JACQUELINE TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
MARION ROBSON Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH CARR Trustee
None on record
CATHERINE DEAGLE Trustee
None on record
JUNE ANN ANDERSON Trustee
None on record
JOAN MURIEL COTTISS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £3.91k £3.14k £4.16k £687 £1.61k
Total expenditure £3.93k £3.13k £4.48k £526 £2.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 532 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 532 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 MILFIELD AVENUE
WALLSEND
NE28 9JF
Phone:
01912637409
Website:

No information available