THE IAN ADDISON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making to certain specific areas of benefit, namely the education of the general public with particular reference to matters of historic, artistic, architectural or aesthetic interest. The provision of financial assistance for the repair and maintainence of certain religious land or buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Ann Evers | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick William Evers | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Elizabeth Patton | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
IAN RICHARD STAINBURN | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GUPWELL | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM ANTHONY EVERS BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.43k | £32.44k | £34.26k | £36.07k | £39.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.03k | £45.08k | £37.17k | £46.36k | £39.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (A) THE INCREASE OF THEIR KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ANY MATTERS OF HISTORIC, ARTISTIC, ARCHITECTURAL OR AESTHETIC INTEREST; (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, SILVICULTURE AND LAND AND ESTATE MANAGEMENT; (C) THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF CONSERVATION; (D) THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA; AND (E) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF ANY LAND OR BUILDING (INCLUDING ANCILLARY BUILDINGS) OF NATIONAL, HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, ARTISTIC OR AESTHETIC INTEREST ("PUBLIC BUILDINGS") INCLUDING SUCH AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST. 2. THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ANY SUCH LAND OR PUBLIC BUILDINGS 3. THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL FURNITURE, PICTURES, HISTORIC RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MUNIMENTS, ARMOUR, PORCELAIN, SILVER AND GOLD OBJETS D'ART AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS OF NATIONAL, HISTORIC, ARTISTIC OR AESTHETIC INTEREST ASSOCIATED WITH OR DISPLAYED IN ANY SUCH PUBLIC BUILDINGS. 4. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF (A) THE CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HAGLEY AND (B) THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AND THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY WORCESTER AND SUCH OTHER SIMILAR RELIGIOUS LAND OR BUILDINGS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 5. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO AND PROMOTION OF OTHER BODIES ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN, THE SAME AS OR SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SPECIFIED ABOVE INCLUDING (A) THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OF NATURAL BEAUTY AND (B) THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR SCOTLAND FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodlands
Earls Common Road
Stock Green
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B96 6TB
- Phone:
- 01386792116
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window