EAST CLEVELAND YOUTH HOUSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to tackle youth unemployment and the lack of affordable housing. This is achieved by purchasing run-down properties, renovating and renting to vulnerable young people in housing need. The Trust offers training and apprenticeships in construction skills to young people 16-24 years old. It also offers fully supported tenancies to young people between 18 and 24 in East Cleveland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 25 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Michael Bullock | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||
David Eagle | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|||||
valerie Yare | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
drisc angela wardle | Trustee | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CARL DITCHBURN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.17k | £239.49k | £186.17k | £151.50k | £120.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.78k | £156.84k | £189.44k | £149.58k | £148.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £72.07k | N/A | £1.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 AUGUST 2000 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 21ST AUGUST 2002 as amended on 06 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 14-25 YEARS OF AGE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF LOFTUS, LOCKWOOD, BROTTON, GUISBOROUGH, SALTBURN, MARSKE AND NEW MARSKE, STAITHES AND HINDERWELL, IN SUCH A MANNER OR WAY AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF LOFTUS, LOCKWOOD, BROTTON, GUISBOROUGH, SALTBURN, MARSKE AND NEW MARSKE, STAITHES AND HINDERWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
B Hive
Skelton Industrial Estate
Skelton-In-Cleveland
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
Cleveland
TS12 2LQ
- Phone:
- 01287644044
- Email:
- info@ecyhtrust.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window