KING'S SCHOOL, ROCHESTER

Charity number: 1084266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A SCHOOL IN ROCHESTER IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AT WHICH SCHOOL RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Maas Chair 06 December 2022
None on record
Mark Daniel Dawson Chaloner Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Nikki Michelle Cagan Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Kirsty Louise Handel Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Thomas Berner Trustee 27 January 2024
None on record
Wayne Smith Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Alex Marlow Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Patricia Mary Catherine Stewart Trustee 31 August 2022
None on record
Andrew Gower Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Paul Brenden Coen Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Gordon John Giles Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Rev Christopher David Dench Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
ROSEMARY ANN OLLEY Trustee 06 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.72m £9.37m £9.17m £10.94m £11.68m
Total expenditure £9.66m £9.68m £9.68m £10.33m £11.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £544.29k £240.87k £1.37k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £57.37k £38.86k £63.74k £554.79k £251.32k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £8.53m £485.36k £437.23k
Income - Charitable activities £9.07m £8.43m £561.42k £9.86m £10.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £523.02k £106.37k
Income - Investment £32.11k £37.80k £16.84k £44.71k £89.17k
Income - Other £561.15k £869.53k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £360 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.12m £9.24m £9.35m £9.91m £10.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £539.03k £431.88k £330.49k £412.56k £406.19k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £24.41k £0 £29.33k £34.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £11.52m £11.21m £10.87m £10.56m £10.63m
Long-term investments £2.29m £2.38m £2.61m £3.03m £3.36m
Other assets £3.20m £3.11m £2.97m £4.03m £3.70m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£509.00k -£445.73k -£471.53k -£403.42k -£346.19k
Total liabilities £2.22m £2.21m £2.22m £2.83m £2.73m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 17 DECEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE KING'S SCHOOL, ROCHESTER BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ONE OR MORE PUPIL(S) OR PROSPECTIVE PUPIL(S) OF THE SCHOOL BY MEANS OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, GRANTS OR ANY OTHER MEANS AS THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS SHALL THINK FIT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE SCHOOL'S CATCHMENT AREA AND OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
ROCHESTER
Registration history
  • 01 June 2009 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Satis House
Boley Hill
Rochester
Rochester
Kent
ME1 1TE
Phone:
01634888555