CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith by the preaching and proclamation of the Christian Gospel, the teaching of Christian doctrine and principles and the pastoral care of Christian people. The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress. Education on the basis of Christian principles and the promotion of other charitable purposes beneficial to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 February 2001: Standard registration
- 30 October 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 October 2012: Funds transferred to 1135259 KINGDOM ADVANCE NETWORK
- CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- WATCHMAN INTERCESSORS NETWORK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.42k | £181.19k | £219.56k | £234.54k | £87.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.20k | £164.83k | £175.83k | £297.68k | £622.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 23 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 23 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 18 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 18 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE FOURTH SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR ELECTRONICALLY AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE. 4. THE PROMOTION OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN AND AROUND BURTON ON TRENT AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUST MAY FROM TIME TO TIME OPERATE .
Area of benefit
BURTON ON TRENT OR SUCH OTHER PLACES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window