Trustees SHIRLEY 'E' TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Charity number: 1083359

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Cavey | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE NEWMAN | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA HOLLAND | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN STOYEL | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Alcaraz | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA LEES | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN BURFORD | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA WEATHERUP | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE PARDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE HUNSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.