THE LATIMER TRUST

Charity number: 1084337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Publishing, supporting writing and study, to promote and advance the Protestant and Evangelical teaching and principles of the Church of England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,253
Total expenditure: £145,912

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Benjamin Mark Rowland Lucas Trustee 09 January 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LINDFIELD
Received: On time
Rohintan Keki Mody Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Rev Benjamin Charles Sargent Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Rev Dr Ben Cooper Trustee 29 July 2022
None on record
Rev Dr Robert Speight Munro Trustee 29 July 2022
CHURCH SOCIETY
Received: On time
FELLOWSHIP OF WORD AND SPIRIT
Received: On time
Rev James Thomas HUGHES Trustee 10 October 2019
FELLOWSHIP OF WORD AND SPIRIT
Received: On time
THE DUFFIELD GIRLS' AND INFANTS' RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUNDS DUFFIELD
Received: On time
EDWARD POTTERELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE BATES TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Christopher David Edward Moll Trustee 21 October 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEMBDON
Received: On time
REV PETER BRECKWOLDT Trustee 18 April 2011
None on record
Rev MARK EDWARD BURKILL Trustee
CHRIST CHURCH CENTRAL
Received: On time
ST ANTHOLIN'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH Trustee
ANGLICAN MAINSTREAM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.40k £24.74k £46.52k £30.42k £19.25k
Total expenditure £158.60k £147.86k £130.66k £135.62k £145.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 12 October 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 12 October 2021 12 days late
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
Vicarage Lane
Duffield
BELPER
Derbyshire
DE56 4EB
Phone:
01332 281 867