THE FLOUNDERS' FOLLY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining Flounders Folly and enabling public access to it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 19 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES SEABURY SALMON | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ernest Wood | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Manley | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Wilson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nevine Bentley | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DAVID COMPSTON PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ROBERT WOOD | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
URSZULA BARBARA MAY BAUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £253 | £579 | £1.76k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £758 | £269 | £904 | £2.64k | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF SOUTH SHROPSHIRE AND OF THE NATION, ("THE BENEFICIARIES"),THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH SHROPSHIRE INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, ACQUIRING, RENOVATING AND RESTORING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES, THE STRUCTURE, CURTILAGE, SITE AND ENVIRONS OF FLOUNDERS FOLLY, SITUATED ON CALLOW HILL IN THE PARISH OF CULMINGTON IN SHROPSHIRE
Area of benefit
SOUTH SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DHJH Tenbury Wells Llp
81 Teme Street
TENBURY WELLS
Worcestershire
WR15 8AE
- Phone:
- 01584878353
- Email:
- seabury.salmon@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window