CHURCH LAWFORD READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision, up-keep and operation of a village hall for the benefit of the residents of Church Lawford and Kings Newnham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 June 2002: Standard registration
- CHURCH LAWFORD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Mumford | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana James | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Allen | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL THOMAS LINTELL | Trustee | 04 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
Adam Holland MAAT | Trustee | 03 August 2003 |
|
|
||||
MARK MARTIN | Trustee | 06 April 2003 |
|
|||||
DEREK HOLLAND | Trustee | 06 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD ANDREW PARVIN | Trustee | 01 September 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.47k | £16.28k | £19.98k | £17.17k | £19.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.81k | £15.00k | £12.81k | £13.97k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.05k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHURCH LAWFORD (INCORPORATING THE CIVIL PARISHES OF CHURCH LAWFORD AND KINGS NEWNHAM) IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
School Street
Church Lawford
RUGBY
Warwickshire
- Phone:
- 07403640832
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window