BRITISH LIMBLESS EX-SERVICE MEN'S ASSOCIATION (BLESMA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blesma supports all serving and ex service men and women who lose limbs or the use of limbs, or one or both eyes in service or as a result of service. It also supports those ex service men and women who lose limbs not as a result of service or loss of use of limbs as a result of a traumatic incident. Blesma also supports widows and dependents of the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,365,544
Donations and legacies | £4.11m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.00m | |
Other | £251.73k |
Total expenditure:
£6,083,240
Raising funds | £1.16m | |
Charitable activities | £4.92m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,327,170 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.92m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.92m | |
Retained for future use | £609.47k |
People

53 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 December 2000: Standard registration
- 21 March 2017: Funds received from 1059010 NORMANDY VETERANS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND - NO...
- 20 June 2022: Funds received from 1006623 OPEN DOORS
- 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1166685 THE QUEEN'S LANCASHIRE REGIMENT VETERANS CHARITY.
- 06 July 2023: Funds received from 261179 THE H J CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 May 2025: Funds received from 280302 THE ANDERTON FOUNDATION
- BLESMA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Grant Martin Davis CB CBE | Chair | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Johnston | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Heritage | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WHITWORTH | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mistlin | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Gilbert | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kerrigan | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liam Maguire | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen White | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miles Courtenay Ambler | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Laura Grant | Trustee | 11 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84m | £4.76m | £4.23m | £3.96m | £5.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.23m | £5.23m | £5.40m | £6.35m | £6.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £413.04k | £277.34k | £31.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.90m | £4.06m | £3.01m | £3.02m | £4.11m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £413.04k | £65.00k | £165.38k | £198.93k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £909.62k | £475.93k | £640.26k | £709.72k | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Other | £2.61m | £153.43k | £406.34k | £23.08k | £251.73k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.24m | £2.23m | £687.58k | £1.24m | £2.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.17m | £4.17m | £4.29m | £5.29m | £4.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.06m | £1.07m | £1.11m | £1.06m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £51.16k | £62.30k | £51.61k | £44.00k | £65.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £110.33k | £113.14k | £124.27k | £127.20k | £119.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.38m | £3.30m | £3.14m | £3.00m | £2.91m | |
|
Long-term investments | £32.05m | £33.76m | £36.66m | £32.77m | £32.97m | |
|
Other assets | £6.43m | £5.52m | £5.04m | £3.37m | £3.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £550.40k | £415.53k | £414.42k | £510.80k | £523.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 17 OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUN 2016 as amended on 13 Jun 2021 as amended on 25 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND WELL-BEING OF ALL SERVING AND EX-SERVICE MEN AND WOMEN WHO HAVE LOST A LIMB OR LIMBS OR ONE OR BOTH EYES AS A RESULT OF SERVICE IN ANY BRANCH OF HER MAJESTY'S FORCES OR AUXILIARY FORCES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DEFINED. 2)TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND WELL-BEING OF ALL THOSE SERVING AND EX-SERVICE MEN AND WOMEN WHO SUFFER LOSS OF A LIMB, PERMANENT LOSS OF SPEECH, HEARING; OR THE LOSS OF SIGHT IN ONE OR BOTH EYES; OR THE USE OF A LIMB. 3) TO ASSIST NEEDY WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND NEEDY DEPENDANTS OF THE ABOVE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Limbless Ex-Service Mens
Association
115 New London Road
Chelmsford
Essex
CM2 0QT
- Phone:
- 02085483512
- Email:
- info@blesma.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window