Trustees FRIENDS OF ACADEMIC RESEARCH IN GEORGIA (FARIG)

Charity number: 1084314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof Dan Healey Trustee 05 May 2025
None on record
Dr Stephen Francis Jones Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Ian David Colvin Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Dr Eberhard Sauer Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Dr Katie Campbell Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record
Prof Hubertus Friedrich Jahn Trustee 29 October 2021
None on record
SALLY WHITE Trustee
None on record
ROBERT ANGUS KEITH SCALLON Trustee
None on record