GOOD BOOKS AND SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian Bookshop. Various local ministers of religion are Patrons and we are supported by and work closely with Churches Together in Bridport and District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 February 2001: Standard registration
- GOOD BOOKS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Anthony O'Farrell | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Michele Craddock | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Sidney Craddock | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Jenkins | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARY JAMES MITCHELL | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clifford Green | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOIS GERALDINE GRIBBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.67k | £21.52k | £22.96k | £12.66k | £14.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £13.04k | £14.62k | £17.24k | £17.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £12.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SOUTH WEST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 7A
St. Michaels Trading Estate
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 3RR
- Phone:
- 01308420483
- Email:
- mail@goodbooksbridport.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window