Financial history TETBURY RAIL LANDS REGENERATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1092160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £180.14k £190.80k £217.59k £252.20k £296.66k
Total expenditure £132.56k £201.61k £229.72k £247.37k £292.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.69k £33.15k £14.00k N/A £16.70k