THE BRITISH PTERIDOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the society are to promote all aspects of Pteridology by encouraging the appreciation, conservation, cultivation and scientific study of ferns, horsetails, clubmosses, selaginellas and quillworts through publications, indoor meetings, educational events for the public, and field trips in the UK and overseas, the provision of grants and attendance at horticultural shows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 June 2002: Standard registration
- BPS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabelle Cantillon | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tolman | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Madders | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Junka Taylor | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Sutton | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Gavin Hill | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julian Phillip Reed | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Blake | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALEC EDWARD GREENING | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sue Dockerill | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Jean Evans | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Dyer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON MARY PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROB COOKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
GILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN HENRY RICKARD BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN DUDLEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.43k | £28.18k | £25.84k | £27.58k | £23.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.30k | £25.98k | £25.65k | £30.52k | £24.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1961 WITH AMENDMENTS 1972, 1975, 1983, 2000, 2002 AND 5 APRIL 2008. as amended on 22 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO PROMOTE ALL ASPECTS OF PTERIDOLOGY BY ENCOURAGING THE APPRECIATION, CONSERVATION, CULTIVATION AND SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF FERNS, HORSETAILS, CLUBMOSSES AND QUILLWORTS THROUGH PUBLICATIONS, MEETINGS, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATURAL HISTORY MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 5BD
- Phone:
- 07840 288141
- Email:
- secretary@ebps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window